judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4132
B-4132
07/18/1973
Application for Writ of Error
HUMBLE OIL AND REFINING CO.
WESLEY WEST, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/26/1974Errata Filed
05/28/1974Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
05/09/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
03/12/1974Post submission brief filedRespondent
02/15/1974Post submission brief filedRespondent
09/12/1973Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/05/1973Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/20/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
07/18/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/13/1974Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
07/26/1974Errata Filed
06/24/1974Order from Lower Court filed
05/28/1974Brief in Support of Petition
05/09/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/24/1974Opinion issued
03/12/1974Post submission brief filed
02/15/1974Post submission brief filed
11/28/1973Document received (See Remarks)
09/12/1973Reply to Response
09/05/1973Amicus Curiae Brief received
08/20/1973Response to Petition
07/18/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/18/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Wesley West, et al.Respondent
Houston Lighting and Power CompanyAmicus Curiae
Humble Oil and Refining Co.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information