judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

CURTIS E. CRAWFORD V. ADRIANNE TODMAN, ETAL

Case Information: 10-CV-1624
Short Caption:CURTIS E. CRAWFORD V. ADRIANNE TODMAN, ETALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB2288-10Filed Date:12/22/2010

Opening Event Date:12/22/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/11/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/26/2011
Argued/Submitted:02/14/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/19/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantCurtis E. CrawfordYPro SeN
Appellee Todman N
Hans Froelicher, IVNN
Mashanda MosleyYN
AppelleeMoone Karen N
Hans Froelicher, IVNN
Mashanda MosleyYN
AppelleeJim Mccray N
Hans Froelicher, IVNN
Mashanda MosleyYN
AppelleeAmilia Marhsall N
Hans Froelicher, IVNN
Mashanda MosleyYN
AppelleeNancy Taylor N
Hans Froelicher, IVNN
Mashanda MosleyYN
AppelleeLorry Bonds N
Hans Froelicher, IVNN
Mashanda MosleyYN
AppelleeDawn Smeriglio N
Hans Froelicher, IVNN
Mashanda MosleyYN
AppelleeD.C. Housing AuthorityN
Hans Froelicher, IVNN
Mashanda MosleyYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/14/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT SHALL w/n 20 days from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been IMPROPERLY FILED since no final order has been designated for review... (BY: ETW)
01/24/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
02/07/2011 ON FURTHER CONSIDERATION of this court's 1/14/11 order...the response thereto, wherein appellant has identified a 12/14/10 order which denied the motion for new trial, and it appearing that appelallant has been granted IFP status in the trial court and the NO TRANSCRIPT IS NEEDED for this appeal, it is ORDERED that the 1/14/11 OTSC is hereby DISCHARGED. It is *****MORE*****
02/07/2011 F/ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (ETW) LW
02/11/2011RECORD COPIES
02/11/2011RECORD INDEX
02/11/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/16/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellees' briefs shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
03/03/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF no appendix
03/10/2011LETTER - from District of Columbia letting court know that they are not a party to the case...
03/14/2011RECEIVED - Aplt's appdx (Sent back, incorrect format, not enough copies etc.)
03/21/2011APPENDIX
03/29/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 5/2/11 (elp)
03/31/2011 On consideration of appellees' consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellees' brief shall be filed on or before May 2, 2011. (JAC) elp
04/19/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
04/21/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo
05/02/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to aple's motion for summary affirmance.
07/26/2011FiledOrder Denying MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE and MOTION FOR REVERSAL
08/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until Sept. 26, 2011 (Appellee Bonds, Appellee District of Columbia Housing Authority, Appellee Karen, Appellee Marhsall, Appellee Mccray, Appellee Smeriglio, Appellee Taylor, Appellee Todman)Granted
09/14/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until Sept. 26, 2011 (Appellee Bonds, Appellee District of Columbia Housing Authority, Appellee Karen, Appellee Marhsall, Appellee Mccray, Appellee Smeriglio, Appellee Taylor, Appellee Todman)
09/26/2011FiledBrief (Appellee Bonds, Appellee District of Columbia Housing Authority, Appellee Karen, Appellee Marhsall, Appellee Mccray, Appellee Smeriglio, Appellee Taylor, Appellee Todman)
09/26/2011FiledAppendix (Appellee Bonds, Appellee District of Columbia Housing Authority, Appellee Karen, Appellee Marhsall, Appellee Mccray, Appellee Smeriglio, Appellee Taylor, Appellee Todman)
09/26/2011FiledBriefing Completed
10/11/2011FiledReply Brief (Titled: Appellant's Opposition to Brief of District of Columbia Housing Authority . . . ) (Appellant)
10/24/2011FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
12/15/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
02/14/2012FiledSubmitted To Glickman,Oberly,Belson
02/23/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Glickman and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Belson, Senior Jduge)
03/19/2012FiledMandate