judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DONALD LEE ROLLE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0086)
Case Number:S-09-0086Case Docketed On:04/30/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:DONALD LEE ROLLE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DONALD LEE ROLLE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDonald Lee RolleMichael H. Reese
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 100
Citation:236 P.3d 259

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/30/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/30/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/06/2009Motion - Withdrawal of counselMotionWithdrawal of counselFinal
05/06/2009Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance by Michael H. Reese to appear on behalf of AppellantNotice-IncomingEntry of appearanceFinal
05/07/2009Order - Granting withdrawal of counselOrderGranting withdrawal of counselFinal
06/12/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/12/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/12/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/28/2009Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/28/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for second extension of time to file briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/28/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
09/16/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
09/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for third extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/17/2009Order - Grant - third extension of timeOrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
09/28/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
09/29/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of the appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/08/2009Correspondence - Incoming from AppellantCorrespondenceIncomingFinal
11/12/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
11/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/01/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
12/10/2009Event - Phone Call - District Court Clerk called re record on appeal. Due to volume of pleadings, record in be transmitted within the next few days.EventPhone CallFinal
12/21/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
12/21/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, fifteen volumes. Volumes I-V, Original Papers; Volumes VI - XIII, Transcripts; Volume XIV, Confidential Folder; Volume XV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
12/21/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/12/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
01/15/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
01/19/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Michael Reese for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
02/18/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Michael H. Reese for appellant; Graham M. Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
02/18/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/16/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/03/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/03/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/03/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/05/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cards - Record signed for 8/4/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal