judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

COAST HOTELS VS. LABOR COMMISSION

Case Information: 34906
Short Caption:COAST HOTELS VS. LABOR COMMISSIONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A401122Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:06/15/2001 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:06/15/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/29/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Coast Hotels and Casinos, Inc.--check no. 40852.
09/29/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 99-09356
10/07/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returned unfiled the original and two copies of the the docketing statement.
10/07/1999Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 99-09675
10/13/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-09931
10/25/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. August 2, 1999 Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Joy Hinck. 99-10406
03/24/2000Docketing StatementReceived Docketing Statement. (from State Labor Commission) 00-04804
03/29/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. 00-05094
05/16/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Court reporter Hinck shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the requested transcripts held on August 2, 1999 or to file a motion for an extension of time. On March 27, 2000, this court received the docketing statement from respondents/cross-appellants. Because that document was submitted after the due date, it was not filed. Respondents/cross-appellants shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file a motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement. 00-08150
05/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Court reporter Joy Hinch shall have 20 days to file the requested transcripts held on August 2, 1999 or a motion for an extension of time. On March 29, 2000, a notice of cross-appeal was filed in this court. Cross-appellants Nevada State Labor Commission and Gail Maxwell shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file a transcript request form or certificate of no transcript. 00-08501
05/30/2000MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondents/Cross-Appellants Maxwell/Nevada State Labor Commission's Response Re: Transcripts and Filing Their Request Therefor. 00-09075
05/30/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-09076
06/23/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We vacate that portion of the May 22, 2000, or directing respondents/cross-appellants to file a transcript request form or certificte of no transcript. Respondents/cross-appellants shall within 10 days from the date of this order inform this court in writing which transcripts they wish this court to review in this appeal. We grant respondents/cross-appellants motion for an extension of time to file the docketing statement. The clerk shall forthwith file the docketing statement provisionally submitted on March 24, 2000. To date, court reporter Hinck has not filed the requeted transcripts or otherwise communicated with this court. In the interest of judicial efficiency, the clerk of this court shall forthwith file the transcript of proceedings held on August 2, 1999, which was attached as an exhibit to respondents/cross-appellants' response of May 30, 2000. We vacate that portion of our order of May 22, 2000, directing court reporter hinck to file certified copies of the proceedings held on August 2, 2000. 00-10783
06/23/2000Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. (From State Labor Commission). 00-04804
06/23/2000TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: August 2, 1999. Court Reporter: Dina Dee Dalton. 00-10787
07/03/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Respondent/Cross-Appellants Maxwell/Nevada State Labor Commission's Response Re: Transcript for Consideration on Appeal. 00-11318
08/31/2000MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. Respondents/Cross-Appellants Maxwell/Nevada State Labor Commission's Motion to Dismiss. 00-15396
09/05/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellant's Opposition to Respondents/Cross-Appellants Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 00-15557
09/05/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-15558
09/08/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Respondents' Opposition to Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time in Which to File Opening Brief. 00-15876
09/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On August 31, 2000, respondent/cross-appellants filed a motion to dismiss appellant/cross-respondent's appeal pursuant to NRAP 31(c). We decline to dismiss appellant/cross-respondent's appeal and deny the motion to dismiss filed on August 31, 2000. Cause appearing, we grant appellant/cross-respondent's motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief. The appellant/cross-respondent shall have to October 3, 2000, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix in this appeal. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 00-16671
10/02/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. Mailed on: 9/29/00. 00-17393
10/02/2000AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. Appellant/Cross-Respondent. 00-17395
11/03/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Respondents/Cross-Appellants. Mailed on: 10/31/00. 00-19370
11/06/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Appellant/Cross-Respondent Coast Hotels and Casinos, Inc.'s Reply Brief. Mailed on: 11/3/00. 00-19492
11/07/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Original Copy of Answering Brief. See docket entry of 11/03/00. Mailed on: Fed Ex 11/06/00. (00-19370)
11/20/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief on Cross-Appeal. Respondent's Reply Brief. Respondent/Cross-Appellant Nevada State Labor Commission, Gail Maxwell. Mailed on: 11/16/00. 00-20367
05/02/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on June 15, 2001 at 9:00 a.m. (En Banc)
05/29/2001BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Appellant Coast Hotels and Casinos, Inc.'s Supplemental Memorandaum of Points and Authorities. 01-08915
05/30/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
06/06/2001BriefFiled Supplemental Authorities. Respondents/Cross-Appellants Maxwell/ Nevada State Labor Commission's Supplemental Authorities in Support of their Answering Brief. 01-09409
06/15/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the Court En Banc. En Banc.
11/15/2001Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed in part and reversed in part." Before the Court En Banc. Per Curiam-Maupin, C.J. concurring. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 68. En Banc. 01-19036
12/12/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19643
12/12/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 17, 2001. 01-19643