judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PHILLIPS (RONALD) VS. WARDEN

Case Information: 34626
Short Caption:PHILLIPS (RONALD) VS. WARDENCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9701413HClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:10/08/1999How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/06/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/06/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07230
09/16/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 99-08760
10/08/1999Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 99-09738
10/08/1999Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
11/18/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-11479
12/14/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-12553
12/14/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
12/17/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on Deember 15, 1999. 99-12553