judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FOWLER, RODNEY UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-0636
Short Caption:FOWLER, RODNEY UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F2935-79Filed Date:05/22/1980

Opening Event Date:05/22/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/26/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:09/16/1983
Argued/Submitted:01/11/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Bradley A. ThomasYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FOWLER, RODNEY UNITED STATES
05/22/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/26/1980FiledRecord Completed
09/16/1983FiledBriefing Completed
01/11/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
02/21/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition