judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WYNN L. CHRISTENSEN, RENEE C. HUNTER, and REX E. CHRISTENSEN v. C. BURKE CHRISTENSEN, individually and in his capacity as President of 7-C Industries, Inc., and PEGGY C. MILLER, individually and in her capacity as Secretary of 7-C Industries, Inc. and JOAN S. HAMBLIN and DIANE C. BUXTON

Case Heading (S-07-0061)
Case Number:S-07-0061Case Docketed On:03/19/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Ninth Judicial District Teton CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:WYNN L. CHRISTENSEN, RENEE C. HUNTER, and REX E. CHRISTENSEN v. C. BURKE CHRISTENSEN, individually and in his capacity as President of 7-C Industries, Inc., and PEGGY C. MILLER, individually and in her capacity as Secretary of 7-C Industries, Inc. and JOAN S. HAMBLIN and DIANE C. BUXTON
Full Title:WYNN L. CHRISTENSEN, RENEE C. HUNTER, and REX E. CHRISTENSEN, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. C. BURKE CHRISTENSEN, individually and in his capacity as President of 7-C Industries, Inc., and PEGGY C. MILLER, individually and in her capacity as Secretary of 7-C Industries, Inc., Appellees (Defendants), and JOAN S. HAMBLIN and DIANE C. BUXTON, Appellees (Defendant-Intervenors).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWynn L. ChristensenDavid G. Lewis
AppellantRenee C. HunterDavid G. Lewis
AppellantRex E. ChristensenDavid G. Lewis
AppelleeC. Burke ChristensenFranklin J. Falen
Brandon Lee Jensen
Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow
AppelleePeggy C. MillerFranklin J. Falen
Brandon Lee Jensen
Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow
AppelleeJoan S. HamblinFranklin J. Falen
Brandon Lee Jensen
Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow
AppelleeDiane C. BuxtonFranklin J. Falen
Brandon Lee Jensen
Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Other
Opinion Number:2008 WY 10
Citation:176 P.3d 626 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/19/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/19/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/29/2007Notice-Incoming - Other; amended docket indexNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
05/07/2007Brief - Appellant (Counsel will send copy of order to attach to briefs)BriefAppellantFinal
05/14/2007Event - Phone Call - received call from counsel for appellee indicating that the certificate of service date on their copy of brief of appellant was changed - crossed out 6th and wrote in 9th. Due date calculated manually to conform.EventPhone CallFinal
05/24/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended index (second amended)Notice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
06/18/2007Brief - AppelleesBriefAppelleeFinal
07/03/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/03/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/13/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal, three volumes. Volumes I & II, original papers; Volume III, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/14/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/22/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David Lewis for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/28/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting, Kathryn Brack Morrow on behalf of appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Additional authority from counsel for appellantsNotice-IncomingAdditional authorityFinal
09/18/2007Response/Objection - Other - notice of additional authorityResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
09/20/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David G. Lewis for appellants; Brandon Lee Jensen and Kathryn Joy Brack Morrow, argument by Ms. Morrow for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/20/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/01/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Kite writing for the court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
02/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
02/20/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
02/20/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
02/20/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/26/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 2/22/08 by E. Johnson.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal