judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0411-94
PD-0411-94
04/18/1994
PDR Case Type
WILLIAMS, EX PARTE JOHN PHILLIPS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/18/1994FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
08/17/1994REHEAR DISPDENIED
08/17/1994REHEAR DISPDENIED
07/05/1994REHEAR FILED PDR
07/05/1994REHEAR FILED
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
04/18/1994PDR FILED
04/18/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/29/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateBruce Isaacks
WILLIAMS, EX PARTE JOHN PHILLIApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)H. F. Rick Hagen
Court of Appeals Information:
02-93-00240-CR
AFF 2-9-94
2nd Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
362nd District Court
Denton
Honorable DAVID WHITE
F-92-328-D