judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00392-CR
14-94-00392-CR
04/18/1994
Robbery
Deveroux, John
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/08/1996Case stored
06/20/1996Mandate due to be issued
06/20/1996Mandate Issued
06/20/1996Mandate Issued
06/05/1996Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
03/18/1996Petition for discretionary review due
03/15/1996Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
03/06/1996No motion for rehearing FILED
03/01/1996Motion for rehearing DUE
02/15/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
02/15/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/24/1996Submitted
01/24/1996Submission
01/24/1996Submitted
12/13/1995Submission
09/26/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/26/1994Case ready to be set
09/26/1994Case ready to be set
09/22/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
09/12/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/15/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/14/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
07/11/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/14/1994Record Filed (Both records FILED)
06/14/1994Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
04/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/15/1994Date of Sentence
04/15/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/18/2017Case StoredCase archived
06/20/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
DEVEROUX, JOHNCriminal - AppellantMargaret C. Lombardo
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasErnest Davila
STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasErnest Davila
Trial Court Information
248th District Court
Harris
Honorable FRANK C. PRICE
672622
25 yrs. TDC