judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARCUS PATTERSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1611
Short Caption:MARCUS PATTERSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Lead: 08-CF-0876 Consolidated:10-CO-1611
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF3-17813-07Filed Date:12/23/2010

Opening Event Date:12/23/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/28/2011
Argued/Submitted:09/13/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/12/2014
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Amicus-AppellantPublic Defender Service
James W. KleinNY
AppellantMarcus M. Patterson Y
Dennis M. HartYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth H. DanelloYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/23/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/11/2011ORDERED, sua sponte, that the stay entered by this court on May 26, 2010, in appeal no. 08-CF-876, is hereby vacated. F/O, sua sponte, that appeals nos. 08-CF-876 and 10-CO-1611 are consolidated for all purposes herein. F/O that Dennis M. Hart, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal nunc pro tunc to December 24, 2010. F/O that the Clerk of the Superior Court shall prepare and transmit the record index and record copies in appeal 10-CO-1611 to this court forthwith. F/O that the brief of appellant addressing the issues raised in appeal no. 10-CO-1611 shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (ETW)
01/20/2011RECORD COPIES (10-CO-1611)
01/20/2011RECORD INDEX (10-CF-1611)
01/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF (10-CO-1611)
02/22/2011APPENDIX (10-CO-1611)
03/17/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE (Joint) w/appeal 08CF876
03/28/2011ORDERED that the joint motion is denied as moot. F/O that the brief of appellee in appeal no. 10-CO-1611 remain due on or before March 29, 2011. (ETW)
03/28/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF (10CO1611)
03/28/2011FiledBriefing Completed
04/08/2011FiledFinal Screening-Regular
04/20/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
06/21/2011 It appearing that this appeal is likely to be calendared for argument during the month(s) of Sept 2011 through Nov 2011, it is ORDERED that counsel shall advise this court in writing by July 15, 2011, of specific dates du ring that period when they are unavailable so that the court can attempt to avoid such dates in scheduling argument. (Please see the attached instruction sheet.) (aj) Julio Castillo Clerk
06/27/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
06/27/2011LETTER FROM COUNSEL/PARTY RE FUTURE CALENDARING aple
07/27/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
09/08/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File - an amended/corrected brief for (08-CF-876) (no oppo) (Appellant)
09/08/2011LodgedAmended/Corrected Brief (08-CF-876) (Appellant)
09/08/2011FiledNotice Received from Appellee regarding missing page of their Appendix (attached photo) (Appellee)
09/08/2011FiledRule 28(k) Citation Of Supplemental Authority (Appellee)
09/13/2011FiledArgued Before Glickman,Thompson,Nebeker Dennis M.Hart Esq.,for appellant Elizabeth H.Danello Esq.,for appellee
09/21/2011FiledOrder Granting aplt's consent motion to amend brief.
09/21/2011FiledAmended/Corrected Brief (Appellant)
02/16/2012FiledAffirmed (OPINION) (Glickman and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Nebeker, Senior Judge.)
03/01/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File a petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc for 90 days (Appellant)Granted
03/07/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc to 5/30/12.
05/30/2012FiledPetition For Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)Granted in Part/Denied in Part
05/30/2012FiledMOTION - Appear Amicus and to file lodged memorandum in support of appellant's petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc. (Amicus-Appellant)
05/30/2012LodgedMemorandum in support of petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc. (Amicus-Appellant)
06/14/2012FiledOrdered that appellee, within 14 days from the date of this order, shall file a response (ten copies) thereto.
07/11/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File appellee's response to appellant's petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc. Opposition/Reply/Answer (Appellee)Granted
07/13/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file a response by 8/24/12.
08/22/2012FiledAnswer/Response to appellant's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc (Appellee)
10/11/2012FiledOrder Granting Petition For Rehearing and the opinion of the court of February 16, 2012, 37 A.3d 230 (D.C. 2012) is amended. F/O that the concurring opinion is withdrawn. F/O that appellant's petition for rehearing en banc is denied.
12/20/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
03/12/2014FiledMandate