judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 03-94-00190-CV
03-94-00190-CV
04/15/1994
Child custody/adoption/termination
Leah Lou Dees
Robert Edward Dees
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/30/2004Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
10/22/1996CASE STORED
01/05/1995Mandate Issued
11/02/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/02/1994Submitted
11/02/1994Submission
10/12/1994Submission
09/21/1994Oral argument request overruled by CourtOverruled
09/16/1994Brief filed
09/16/1994Case ready to be set
09/08/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedOverruled
08/25/1994Brief filed
08/25/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/22/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
08/08/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/27/1994Response requested (postcard)
06/29/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispOverruled
06/29/1994Order EnteredOverruled
06/20/1994Brief received, not filed
06/07/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/03/1994Letter received
05/27/1994miscellaneous motion dispOverruled
05/26/1994Statement of Facts Received
05/18/1994Transcript Filed
04/25/1994Response to Motion
04/25/1994Response to Motion
04/15/1994miscellaneous motion filed
04/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/05/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dees, Robert EdwardAppelleeMr. Jeffrey R. Hill
Dees, Leah LouAppellantMr. David K. Sergi
Trial Court Information
274th District Court
Hays
Honorable Linda Rodriguez
93-0324