judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0409-94
PD-0409-94
04/18/1994
PDR Case Type
BALEW, MICHAEL T.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/01/1994FINAL DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
05/23/1994NO RESPONSE FILED
04/18/1994PDR FILED
04/18/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BALEW, MICHAEL T.Applicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Barry Bryan
STATE OF TEXASStateGuy James Gray
Court of Appeals Information:
09-93-00085-CR
AFF 3-16-94
9th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
1st District Court
Jasper
Honorable JOE BOB GOLDEN
7864