judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-94-00188-CR
06-94-00188-CR
04/18/1994
Felony DWI
Yarbrough, Deborah Ann
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/24/1995Mandate Issued
12/06/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/29/1994Submitted
11/29/1994Case ready to be set
11/29/1994Submission
11/07/1994LETTER
07/26/1994Brief Filed
06/13/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/06/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/10/1994Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
04/21/1994Holding for Record
04/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
04/12/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/24/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Yarbrough, Deborah AnnAppellantHon. Jerry Spencer Davis
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law
Hunt
Honorable Joe M. Leonard
CR-835-91
15 Dys Jail/DL Suspend 180