judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0349
94-0349
04/18/1994
application for writ of error granted by Court
J. DAVID BLANKENSHIP II
RONALD A. ROBINS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/22/1994Reply to ResponseRespondent
04/18/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/01/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the mandate date of a processCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive mandate date.
08/01/1994Mandate issuedRemanded to the Fourteenth Court of Appeals 878 SW2d 138
06/15/1994Application for Writ of Error - Disposedapplication granted pursuant to Rule 170, TRAPCONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive disposition info.
06/15/1994Application for Writ of Error - Disposedapplication granted pursuant to Rule 170, TRAPWITH PER CURIAM OPINION ISSUED
06/15/1994Court approved judgment sent to attorneys of recordJUDGMENT OF CT/APPEALS REVERSED; REMANDED TO 14TH CT/APPEALS
06/15/1994Opinion issuedCourt of Appeals' judgment reversed; remanded to Court of AppealsPER CURIAM OPINION 878 SW2d 138
06/15/1994Writ of error issued to Court of Appeals.
04/28/1994Case forwarded to Court
04/22/1994Reply to Response
04/18/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/01/1994Case StoredCase stored.Remanded to the Fourteenth Court of Appeals
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ROBINS, RONALD A.RespondentMr. E. Lawrence Vincent Jr.
BLAKENSHIP, II, J. DAVIDPetitionerMr. Michael Duncan
Mr. Raymond L. Britton
Court of Appeals Information:
Dismissed WOJ
RULE 90, 02-03-94
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable PAUL C. MURPHY
Trial Court Information
333rd District Court
Harris
Honorable Richard P. Bianchi
91-23471-A