judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0342
94-0342
04/18/1994
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
STEPHAN ISSAC ABERGEL
THE HONORABLE HENRY SCHUBLE JUDGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
04/20/1994Reply to Petition for Writ of MandamusRespondenton behalf of Summerford et al.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/08/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/05/1994Case StoredNo Mo/Re filed
06/22/1994M/L/F Petition for Writ of Mandamus disposedOverruled
04/20/1994Call received$5 fee for reply is on the way
04/20/1994Reply to Petition for Writ of Mandamuson behalf of Summerford et al.
04/18/1994Exhibits received1 orig & 4 copies of bound volumes Exs A-J
04/18/1994Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamus
04/18/1994Petition for writ received
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/05/1994Case StoredCase stored.No Mo/Re filed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ABERGEL, PAIGERespondentMs. Christine K. Jonte
SUMMERFORD, FRANCES KINGRespondentMs. Sallee S. Smyth
ABERGEL, STEPHAN ISSACRelatorMr. Harry L. Tindall
Ms. Dianne Zomper
Ms. Blanche V. Stovall
SUMMERFORD, ROBERT ERNESTRespondentMs. Ellen Elkins Grimes
Mr. Walter P. Mahoney Jr.
Court of Appeals Information:
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
245th District Court
Harris
Honorable Henry G. Schuble
91-56581-A