judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: 94-0346
94-0346
04/18/1994
App Writ of Error
TMC MEDICAL LTD.
THE LASATER'S FRENCH QUARTER PARTNERSHIP
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
06/27/1994Motion for RehearingPetitionerRecord in Clerk's office gb Rule 4(b) envelope attached to original
05/03/1994Reply to ResponseRespondent
04/18/1994Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/07/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
08/03/1994Record returned to Court of AppealsNo Mo/Re Overruled
07/28/1994Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
06/27/1994Conditional motion for rehearingNo description available.CONVERSION EVENT: auto-inserted to match archive begin date.
06/27/1994Motion for RehearingRecord in Clerk's office gb Rule 4(b) envelope attached to original
06/27/1994Motion for Rehearing forwardedRecord in Clerk's office
06/08/1994Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDismissed for Want of Jurisdiction
05/05/1994Case forwarded to Court
05/03/1994Reply to Response
04/18/1994Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
08/03/1994Case StoredCase stored.Mo/Re Overruled
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
LASATER'S FRENCH QUARTER PARTNRespondentMr. John E. "Ric" Freeman
Mr. M. Keith Dollahite
TMC MEDICAL, LTD.PetitionerMr. J. Bennett White
Court of Appeals Information:
12-93-00114-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
880 SW2d 789, 12-31-93
12th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Smith
Honorable Randall Lee Rogers
93-1142-F