judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAM J. COMEAU, a/k/a WILLIAM COMEAU v. CAROL NASH, as Personal Representative of the Estate of KENNETH T. MCGRATH

Case Heading (S-09-0075)
Case Number:S-09-0075Case Docketed On:04/10/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Uinta CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Wills, Decedents' Estates and Probate Code (Title 2)
Short Title:WILLIAM J. COMEAU, a/k/a WILLIAM COMEAU v. CAROL NASH, as Personal Representative of the Estate of KENNETH T. MCGRATH
Full Title:WILLIAM J. COMEAU, a/k/a WILLIAM COMEAU, Appellant (Defendant), v. CAROL NASH, as Personal Representative of the Estate of KENNETH T. MCGRATH, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWilliam J. ComeauSharon M. Rose
AppelleeCarol NashV. Anthony Vehar

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Estates, Property
Opinion Number:2010 WY 71
Citation:233 P3d 572

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/10/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/10/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/10/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/27/2009Brief - Appellant; and certificate of costs.BriefAppellantFinal
05/29/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Opening Brief, Designation of Record on Appeal and copies of brief on disks and cdEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/30/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/01/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for 20 Day Extension of Time in Which to File Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/01/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/03/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellee's BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/18/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/19/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/19/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/28/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
08/28/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Bench Trial Volumes I-III; Volume III, Bench Trial Exhibits; Volume IV, Bench Trial Depositions.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/17/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/21/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Sharon Rose for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/25/2009Order - Oral argument rescheduled - moved from October 22, 2009 to October 21, 2009.OrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/05/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from V. Anthony Vehar on behalf of AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/21/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Sharon M. Rose for appellant; V. Anthony Vehar for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/21/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/01/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/17/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/17/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/21/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal