judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MARCEL JOHNSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1610
Short Caption:MARCEL JOHNSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-4294-10Filed Date:12/23/2010

Opening Event Date:12/23/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:05/05/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:10/18/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMarcel Johnson Y
Steven R. KiershYY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/23/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/05/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Steven R. Kiersh, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
01/05/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Steven R. Kiersh, Esquire
02/15/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 5, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
03/01/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
03/01/2011RECEIVED - aplt's statement re transcript.
03/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to file the lodged statement regarding transcript, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. (JAC)
03/10/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed)
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (23 pgs/Van Bremen) 9/1/10 proc.
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (12 pgs/Van Bremen) 9/2/10 proc.
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (107 pgs/Henderson) 9/7/10 proc.
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (140 pgs/Swaringer) 9/8/10 proc.
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (144 pgs/Henderson) 9/9/10 proc.
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (9 pgs/Jeon) 9/10/10 proc. a.m.
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (8 pgs/Henderson) 9/10/10 proc. p.m.
05/05/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #8 (10 pgs/tape) 12/21/10 proc. w/cd
05/05/2011RECORD COMPLETED
05/06/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
05/06/2011APPENDIX
05/09/2011RECORD INDEX
05/09/2011RECORD COPIES
05/12/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, and that the brief and appendix of appellant were filed with this court on May 6, 2011, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellee shall be filed within 30 days from the date of the order. (Castillo)
06/10/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
06/13/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance
09/23/2011FiledOrder Granting MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
09/23/2011FiledAffirmed
10/18/2011FiledMandate
02/08/2012FiledMotion To Recall The Mandate (Appellant--pro se)Denied
02/09/2012FiledTMC//MOTION TO RECALL THE MANDATE
03/13/2012LodgedAffidavit in Support of Motion to Recall the Mandate. (Appellant)
10/25/2012FiledORDER DENYING MOTION TO RECALL MANDATE on the MERITS
11/09/2012LodgedPetition For Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc (Appellant)
11/27/2012FiledLetter To Appellant returning Petition for Rehearing/Rehearing En Banc