judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-94-00189-CV
13-94-00189-CV
04/18/1994
Miscellaneous civil
McNeil, John, Cuero Hydroelectric, Inc. & Jimmy Parker
Lower Colorado River Authority
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/13/1995Mandate Issued
05/26/1995Additional Copies of Misc. Motion
05/25/1995Opinion issuedDismissed
05/25/1995Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/22/1995Miscellaneous Motion
05/11/1995Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/20/1995Miscellaneous Motion
02/06/1995Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
01/09/1995Submission
09/08/1994Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
08/22/1994Brief Filed
08/22/1994Brief received.
08/22/1994Motion for leave to file brief
08/22/1994Oral argument requested
08/17/1994Supplemental citation
06/30/1994Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
06/20/1994Brief Filed
06/20/1994Case ready to be set
06/20/1994Oral argument requested
06/06/1994Additional copy(s) of Motion to Dismiss
06/06/1994Affidavit Filed
05/26/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/23/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
05/16/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/04/1994Letter filed
05/03/1994Green card in
04/26/1994Statement Filed
04/26/199410 day letter sent
04/26/1994Filing Fee Paid
04/21/1994Supplemental transcript recieved
04/18/1994Filing Fee Paid
04/18/1994Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
04/18/1994Statement of Facts Received
04/18/1994Transcript Received
04/18/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/13/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mcneil, John And Cuero HydroelAppellantKerry N. Cammack
W. S. Fly
Mcneil, John Cuero HydroelectAppellantHon. Errol John Dietze
Lower Colorado River AuthorityAppelleeGlen E. Taylor
James N. Rader
Trial Court Information
135th District Court
De Witt
Honorable Joseph P. Kelly
93-7-16,192