judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-2629
B-2629
03/22/1971
Application for Writ of Error
BAY CITY FEDERAL SAVINGS AND LOAN ASSOCIATION, ET AL.
W. SALE LEWIS, SAVINGS AND LOAN COMMISSIONER OF TEXAS, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/03/1972Supplement to ResponseRespondent
12/22/1971Motion for RehearingRespondent
12/22/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/22/1971Response to Brief filedRespondent
06/14/1971Post submission brief filedPetitioner
04/06/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
03/22/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/09/1972Order from Lower Court filed
02/09/1972Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
01/03/1972Supplement to Response
12/29/1971Response to Motion filed
12/27/1971Response to Motion filed
12/22/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/22/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/08/1971Concurring Opinion issued.
12/08/1971Opinion issued
06/22/1971Response to Brief filed
06/14/1971Post submission brief filed
05/02/1971Document received (See Remarks)
05/02/1971Document received (See Remarks)
05/02/1971Document received (See Remarks)
05/02/1971Document received (See Remarks)
04/06/1971Response to Petition
03/22/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/22/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. Sale Lewis, Savings and Loan Commissioner of Texas, et al.Respondent
Bay City Federal Savings and Loan Association, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information