Case Information: 68726 | |||
Short Caption: | HOLM INT'L. PROP.'S, LLC VS. PACIFIC LEGENDS EAST CONDO. ASS'N. | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 68725 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A716949 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | Exempt | |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 07/29/2016 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
08/31/2015 | Filing Fee | Filing fee due for Appeal. Filing fee will be forwarded by the District Court. | ||
08/31/2015 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 15-26329 | |
08/31/2015 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice of Referral to Settlement Program. This appeal may be assigned to the settlement program. Timelines for requesting transcripts and filing briefs are stayed. | 15-26331 | |
09/02/2015 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Exemption from Settlement Program. It has been determined that this appeal will not be assigned to the settlement program. Appellant(s) 15 days transcript request form; 120 days opening brief: | 15-26615 | |
09/04/2015 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Paid. $250.00 from Darius F. Rafie, LTD. Check No. 1804. | ||
09/10/2015 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: 6/16/15. To Court Reporter: Judy Chappell. | 15-27477 | |
09/22/2015 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement Civil Appeals. | 15-28623 | |
12/01/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response due: 30 days. Respondent may file any reply within 11 days from the date that appellants' response is served. Briefing is suspended. | 15-36545 | |
12/08/2015 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. | 15-37452 | |
12/23/2015 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Reinstating Briefing. Court Recorder Judy Chappell's Certificate of Delivery of Transcripts due: 15 days. Opening Brief and Appendix due: 90 days. | 15-39416 | |
12/30/2015 | Transcript | Filed Notice from Court Reporter. Judy Chappell stating that the requested transcripts were delivered. Dates of transcripts: 06/16/15. | 15-39976 | |
03/23/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Opening Brief. | 16-09120 | |
03/23/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume No. I. | 16-09121 | |
03/23/2016 | Appendix | Filed Appellant's Appendix Volume No. II. | 16-09122 | |
04/25/2016 | Brief | Filed Respondent's Answering Brief. | 16-12830 | |
05/25/2016 | Motion | Filed Appellant's Motion to Expand Time to File Appellant's Reply Brief. | 16-16478 | |
05/25/2016 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice Motion/Stipulation Approved. Reply Brief due: June 24, 2016. | 16-16488 | |
06/27/2016 | Brief | Filed Appellant's Reply Brief. | 16-19950 | |
06/27/2016 | Case Status Update | Briefing Completed/To Screening | ||
07/29/2016 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order Submitting Appeal for Decision Without Oral Argument. | 16-23652 | |
03/17/2017 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Reversal and Remand. ORDER the judgment of the district court REVERSED AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order. SNP17-MD/MG/KP. | 17-09066 | |
04/11/2017 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 17-11871 | |
04/11/2017 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/05/2017 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by District Court Clerk on April 24, 2017. | 17-11871 |