judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDY PLEASANT doing business as A. PLEASANT CONSTRUCTION v. GAYE WINTER and JO/ETTA, LLC, a Wyoming close limited liability company

Case Heading (S-09-0059)
Case Number:S-09-0059Case Docketed On:03/25/2009
Linked To: S-09-0058
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Liens (Title 29)
Short Title:ANDY PLEASANT doing business as A. PLEASANT CONSTRUCTION v. GAYE WINTER and JO/ETTA, LLC, a Wyoming close limited liability company
Full Title:ANDY PLEASANT doing business as A. PLEASANT CONSTRUCTION, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. GAYE WINTER and JO/ETTA, LLC, a Wyoming close limited liability company, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAndy PleasantPatrick J. Crank
Matthew D. Obrecht
AppelleeGaye WinterV. Anthony Vehar
AppelleeJo/Etta, LLC, a Wyoming close limited liability companyV. Anthony Vehar

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Contracts, Liens, Trial - Damages
Opinion Number:2010 WY 4
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/25/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/25/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/25/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/25/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/07/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/07/2009Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/23/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/13/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
07/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/29/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volumes III-IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/29/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/04/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
08/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - V. Anthony Vehar for appellants Winter and Jo/Etta, LLC.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/23/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (V. Anthony Vehar for Appellant Winter; Patrick J. Crank for appellee Pleasant) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/23/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
10/15/2009Record - Supplemental record on appeal - Exhibit inadvertantly left out of transmitted record. Volume V of V.RecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
10/15/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, one volume, Volume V, Exhibit 109. Inadvertently left out of transmitted record.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/12/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/28/2010Event - Phone Call - Spoke with Mr. Vehar's office regarding arrangements for the large exhibit tube. We will send to clerk by fed-ex ground using their account number.EventPhone CallFinal
01/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/28/2010Record - Record returned to district court clerk. Two boxes returned by certified mail. Large exhibit tube sent Fed-ex ground.RecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/28/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/28/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
02/03/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cards (2) - Record signed for 2/1/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal