judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PALACIOS DE ORANTES VS. ORANTES

Case Information: 36372
Short Caption:PALACIOS DE ORANTES VS. ORANTESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D245067Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/05/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11351
07/05/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
08/29/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Appellant has failed to respond in any way to this court's directive to pay the filing fee. We conclude that appellant has abandoned this appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-RR/DA/ML 00-15188
09/26/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-15206
09/26/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/25/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 4, 2000. 00-15206