judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4257
A-4257
06/25/1953
Application for Writ of Error
WESTERN TEXTILE PRODUCTS COMPANY OF TEXAS
JOSEPH SIDRAN, DBA SIDRAN SPORTSWEAR
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/01/1953Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/03/1953Response to PetitionRespondent
06/25/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/05/1953Response to Motion filed
12/01/1953Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/18/1953Opinion issued
10/07/1953Document received (See Remarks)
10/07/1953Document received (See Remarks)
10/07/1953Document received (See Remarks)
10/07/1953Document received (See Remarks)
10/07/1953Document received (See Remarks)
07/03/1953Response to Petition
06/25/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/25/1953Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Western Textile Products Company of TexasPetitioner
Joseph Sidran, dba Sidran SportswearRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information