judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4284
A-4284
07/06/1953
Application for Writ of Error
EDDIE THOMAS, ET UX., ET AL.
HOUSING AUTHORITY OF THE CITY OF DALLAS, TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/15/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/09/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/05/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/01/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
12/31/1953Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/18/1953Response to PetitionRespondent
07/06/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/14/1954Order from Lower Court filed
03/15/1954Motion for production of documents filed
03/15/1954Motion to Stay Filed Filing granted
02/15/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/09/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/05/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/01/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
12/31/1953Motion to Argue filed
12/31/1953Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/16/1953Mandate issued
12/16/1953Opinion issued
11/18/1953Response to Petition
10/07/1953Document received (See Remarks)
07/06/1953Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/06/1953Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
League of Texas Municipalities, Texas City Attorneys Association and City of HoustonAmicus Curiae
Housing Authority of the City of Dallas, TexasRespondent
Thompson, Walker, Smith and ShannonAmicus Curiae
Looney, Clark and MoorheadAmicus Curiae
City of Fort WorthAmicus Curiae
Eddie Thomas, et ux., et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information