judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PIPKIN VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 36371
Short Caption:PIPKIN VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D243019Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice LeavittPanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/03/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Leavitt Law Firm.
07/03/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Prohibition and Request for Stay of Proceedings in the District Court. 00-11344
07/03/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
07/06/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Filing fee and proof of service on judge and opposing counsel. Due Date: 10 days
07/10/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Patrick T. Nohrden-check no. 4815.
07/13/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Affidavit of Service to Glenn Schepps. 00-12124
07/13/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Affidavit of Service on Honorable Steven M. Jones. 00-12125
10/20/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due from the real party in interest, on behalf of respondents: 30 days from the date of this order. 00-18610
11/16/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 00-20090
12/20/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. for attorney Patrick Nohrden. 00-22172
04/05/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Denying Petition. We therefore " . . . deny the petition." SNP01A-WM/CY/NB 01-05845
05/01/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-06048
05/01/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.