Case Information: 04-CT-0634 | |||
Short Caption: | DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA V. MICHAEL CATTS | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal - DC - DC Non-Traffic |
Lead: | 04-CT-0597 | Consolidated: | 04-CT-0598 , 04-CT-0599 , 04-CT-0600 , 04-CT-0601 , 04-CT-0602 , 04-CT-0603 , 04-CT-0604 , 04-CT-0605 , 04-CT-0606 , 04-CT-0607 , 04-CT-0608 , 04-CT-0609 , 04-CT-0610 , 04-CT-0611 , 04-CT-0612 , 04-CT-0613 , 04-CT-0614 , 04-CT-0615 , 04-CT-0616 , 04-CT-0617 , 04-CT-0618 , 04-CT-0619 , 04-CT-0620 , 04-CT-0621 , 04-CT-0622 , 04-CT-0623 , 04-CT-0624 , 04-CT-0625 , 04-CT-0626 , 04-CT-0627 , 04-CT-0628 , 04-CT-0629 , 04-CT-0630 , 04-CT-0631 , 04-CT-0632 , 04-CT-0633 , 04-CT-0634, 04-CT-0635 , 04-CT-0636 , 04-CT-0637 , 04-CT-0638 , 04-CT-0639 , 04-CT-0640 , 04-CT-0641 , 04-CT-0642 , 04-CT-0643 , 04-CT-0644 , 04-CT-0645 , 04-CT-0646 , 04-CT-0647 , 04-CT-0648 , 04-CT-0649 , 04-CT-0650 , 04-CT-0651 , 04-CT-0652 , 04-CT-0653 , 04-CT-0654 , 04-CT-0655 , 04-CT-0656 , 04-CT-0657 , 04-CT-0658 , 04-CT-0659 , 04-CT-0660 , 04-CT-0661 , 04-CT-0662 , 04-CT-0663 , 04-CT-0664 , 04-CT-0665 , 04-CT-0666 , 04-CT-0667 , 04-CT-0668 , 04-CT-0669 , 04-CT-0670 , 04-CT-0671 , 04-CT-0672 , 04-CT-0674 , 04-CT-0675 , 04-CT-0676 , 04-CT-0677 , 04-CT-0678 , 04-CT-0679 , 04-CT-0680 , 04-CT-0681 , 04-CT-0682 , 04-CT-0683 , 04-CT-0684 , 04-CT-0685 , 04-CT-0686 , 04-CT-0687 , 04-CT-0688 , 04-CT-0689 , 04-CT-0690 , 04-CT-0691 , 04-CT-0692 , 04-CT-0693 , 04-CT-0694 , 04-CT-0695 , 04-CT-0696 , 04-CT-0697 , 04-CT-0698 , 04-CT-0699 , 04-CT-0700 , 04-CT-0701 , 04-CT-0702 , 04-CT-0703 , 04-CT-0704 , 04-CT-0705 , 04-CT-0706 , 04-CT-0708 , 04-CT-0709 , 04-CT-0710 , 04-CT-0711 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | D2430-03 | Filed Date: | 06/16/2004 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 06/16/2004 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 08/31/2004 | ||
Costs Waived |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | District of Columbia | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Michael Catts | Y |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
06/16/2004 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
07/02/2004 | ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 04-CT-597 to 04-CT-672 & 04-CT-674 to 04-CT-706 & 04-CT-708 to 04-CT-711 hereby. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Carol Elder Bruce, Esquire, is hereby assigned as pro bono counsel for appellees herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that these appeals are hereby stayed pending the decision in District of Columbia v. Seth Kaplan, et al, appeals nos. 04-CT-22 & 04-CT-673. (By: AMW) | |||
07/02/2004 | CASE STAYED | |||
07/22/2004 | APPEARANCE - of Aple's counsel Laura S. Shores 1299 PennsylvaniaAve, NW Washington, DC 2004-2402 (202) 783-0800 (Telephone) (202) 383-6610 (Fax) Counsel for Aple Levine | |||
07/28/2004 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL | |||
08/05/2004 | ORDER GRANT APLT MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEALS, and these appeals are hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13(b). (By: AMW) | |||
08/05/2004 | PROCEED WITH APPEAL, NO LONGER ON HOLD/STAYED | |||
08/05/2004 | DISMISSED | |||
08/31/2004 | MANDATE ISSUED |