judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4774
A-4774
07/01/1954
Application for Writ of Error
J. R. MILAM, JR., ET AL.
MADISON A. COOPER, JR., ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/17/1954Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
11/10/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/21/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/08/1954Response to Brief filedRespondent
09/02/1954Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
07/29/1954Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
07/12/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
07/01/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/08/1954Order from Lower Court filed
12/08/1954Document received (See Remarks)
12/08/1954Document received (See Remarks)
12/07/1954Motion to dismissFiling granted
11/17/1954Brief in Support of Petition
11/10/1954Motion for Rehearing
09/21/1954Reply to Response
09/08/1954Response to Brief filed
09/02/1954Brief in Support of Petition
07/29/1954Supplemental Brief filed
07/12/1954Response to Petition
07/01/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
07/01/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
J. R. Milam, Jr., et al.Petitioner
Madison A. Cooper, Jr., et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information