judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GRANT, III (ISAIAH) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34885
Short Caption:GRANT, III (ISAIAH) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C156283Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:03/05/2001How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-09183
10/08/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. May 19, 1999, July 14, 1999, and July 15, 1999. Proceedings: Court Reporter: Lisa Makowski. 99-09759
10/20/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to file 16 page Fast Track Statement. 99-10239
11/04/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On October 20, 1999, counsel for appellant filed a motion for leave to file a fast track statement in excess of 10 pages. The clerk shall file, forthwith, the fast track statement provisionally submitted on october 20, 1999. 99-10817
11/04/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-10240
11/04/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-10241
11/29/1999MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. Motion for Leave to File 17 page Fast Track Response. 99-11807
12/15/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The clerk shall file, forthwith, the 18 page fast track response provisionally submitted on November 29, 1999. 99-12648
12/15/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-11808
05/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Full Briefing. We have determined that full briefing will assist the court in the disposition of this appeal. Opening brief and appendix due: 40 days. fn2[We suspend the requirement in NRAP9 for counsel to file a certified transcript.] Answering brief and reply brief shall be filed in compliance with NRAP 31. 00-08557
06/28/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-11071
07/27/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-13017
08/23/2000MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: September 25, 2000. 00-14790
09/22/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Express-No postmark. 00-16775
03/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. NNP01A-MS/RR/DA 01-03973
03/05/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/13/2001Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." Before Shearing, Agosti and Rose, JJ. Per Curiam. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 38. NNP01A 01-09831
07/10/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-10333
07/10/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/26/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 12, 2001. 01-10333