judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARTIN HERNANDEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0065)
Case Number:S-09-0065Case Docketed On:03/31/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:MARTIN HERNANDEZ v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MARTIN HERNANDEZ, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMartin HernandezDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2010 WY 33
Citation:227 P.3d 315

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/31/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/31/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/31/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/01/2009Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
04/06/2009Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completion (second copy)RecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
05/18/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/17/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/18/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/29/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/06/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/07/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/08/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
07/08/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
08/11/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Allan Morgan, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/11/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
03/23/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the Court, Chief Justice Voigt filed a dissenting opinionOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
04/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
04/08/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
04/08/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
04/08/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/12/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 4/9/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal