judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4754
A-4754
06/22/1954
Application for Writ of Error
U. S. MCMILLAN
CHARLES W. HURLEY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/04/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/02/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
07/01/1954Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
06/22/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
09/15/1954Response to Motion filed
08/04/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/02/1954Response to Petition
07/01/1954Supplemental Brief filed
06/22/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
06/22/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Charles W. HurleyRespondent
U. S. McMillanPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information