judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MURRAY (DOUGLAS) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34886
Short Caption:MURRAY (DOUGLAS) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C154768Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-09200
10/18/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-10091
10/18/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-10092
10/22/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. September 21, 1999. Proceedings: Court Reporter: Diann Prock. 99-10360
11/02/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-10707
11/19/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML 99-11525
12/15/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-12662
12/15/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/03/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on December 20, 1999. 99-12662