judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DONALD ALICK CROSS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0066)
Case Number:S-09-0066Case Docketed On:04/01/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Property 6-3-101 - 6-3-901
Short Title:DONALD ALICK CROSS v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:DONALD ALICK CROSS, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDonald Alick CrossDonna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Justin Ashkhan Daraie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Procedure
Opinion Number:2009 WY 154
Citation:221 P.3d 972

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/01/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/01/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/01/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/01/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/13/2009Motion - Remand to district courtMotionRemand to district courtFinal
05/14/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion for partial remand for evidentiary hearing on ineffective assistance of counsel; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/14/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file appellant's brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/15/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/02/2009Order - Denying Motion for Partial RemandOrderDenyFinal
06/18/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
06/19/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Donald Alick Cross and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/30/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/30/2009Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval for Justin Daraie, Student Intern, to appear on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
07/31/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee, Consent and Approval for Justin Daraie to appear on behalf of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/18/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/24/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Exhibits; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volume IV, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/24/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/17/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Donna Domonkos for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting from Justin A. Daraie to appear on behalf of AppelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/20/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Donna D. Domonkos for appellant; D. Michael Pauling, Senior Assistant Attorney General, and Justin A. Daraie, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Daraie for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/20/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
12/17/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/30/2009Petition - Rehearing; and brief in support of petition for rehearing.PetitionRehearingFinal
01/04/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Petition for Rehearing and Brief in SupportEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/12/2010Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
01/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/12/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/12/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/12/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/15/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/14/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal