judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

GEORGE E. CARTER V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1587
Short Caption:GEORGE E. CARTER V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Other Criminal
Lead: 10-CO-1586 Consolidated:10-CO-1587, 10-CO-1588
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL4270-86Filed Date:12/17/2010

Opening Event Date:12/17/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:01/20/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:06/07/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantGeorge E. Carter YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/03/2011ORDER, SUA SPONTE, CONSOLIDATING APPEALS nos. 10-CO-1586, 10-CO-1587 and 10-CO-1588 for all purposes herein. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a consolidated briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record indexes and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
01/10/2011RECORD INDEX (10CO1588)
01/10/2011RECORD COPIES (10CO1588)
01/20/2011RECORD COPIES (10-CO-1587)
01/20/2011RECORD INDEX (10-CO-1587)
01/20/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/24/2011RECORD INDEX (10CO1586)
01/24/2011RECORD COPIES (10CO1586)
01/28/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
03/16/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 28, 2011, directing appellant to file the brief, and the limited appendix, as required by D.C.App. R. 30 (f), within 40 days and it appearing that the brief and the limited appendix have not been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the brief of appellant and the limited appendix shall be submitted within 20 days from the date of this order, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the documents or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply with this order shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice. See D.C. App. R. 13. (Castillo)
05/13/2011ORDERED: That these appeals are hereby dismissed. See D.C. App. R. 13. (By: ETW)
05/13/2011DISMISSED
06/07/2011MANDATE ISSUED