judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4746
A-4746
06/14/1954
Application for Writ of Error
UNION MERCANTILE, ET AL.
W. W. MCCUTCHEON AND FORT DAVIS STATE BANK
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/28/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
06/21/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
06/20/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/14/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/02/1954Response to Motion filed
07/28/1954Motion for Rehearing
06/21/1954Response to Petition
06/20/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/14/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
06/14/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. W. McCutcheon and Fort Davis State BankRespondent
Union Mercantile, et al.Petitioner
Lynn WalkerAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information