judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-4782
A-4782
07/02/1954
MISC PETITION
R. C. PARKER, ET AL.
SAN JACINTO COUNTY WATER CONTROL AND IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT NO. 1, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/10/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/10/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
11/10/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
10/30/1954Supplemental Brief filed
10/12/1954Appellees' Brief filed
08/21/1954Appellant's Brief filed
07/02/1954Exhibits in case/cause filed
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/15/1954Opinion issued
11/10/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/10/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
11/10/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
10/30/1954Supplemental Brief filed
10/12/1954Appellees' Brief filed
08/21/1954Appellant's Brief filed
07/02/1954Exhibits in case/cause filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
State Board of Water Engineers of Texas and John Ben Shepperd, Attorney General of TexasAmicus Curiae
R. C. Parker, et al.Appellant
McCall, Parkhurst and CroweAmicus Curiae
San Jacinto County Water Control and Improvement District No. 1, et al.Appellee
Lawrence B. Gunn; Cyril J. Smith; Vinson, Elkins, Weems and SearlsAmicus Curiae
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information