judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-2442
B-2442
12/03/1970
Application for Writ of Error
MARSHALL T. STEVES
UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION, AN UNINCORPORATED INTER-INSURANCE EXCHANGE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/17/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
02/01/1971Response to Brief filedRespondent
01/25/1971Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
12/11/1970Response to PetitionRespondent
12/03/1970Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/17/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
02/01/1971Response to Brief filed
01/25/1971Brief in Support of Petition
12/11/1970Response to Petition
12/03/1970Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/03/1970Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Marshall T. StevesPetitioner
United Services Automobile Association, an Unincorporated Inter-Insurance ExchangeRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information