judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

HENSLEY (DANIEL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38223
Short Caption:HENSLEY (DANIEL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 0100851AClassification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/23/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12489
08/29/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP01A-CY/ML/NB 01-14595
09/25/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-14689
09/25/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/02/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on September 27, 2001. 01-14689