judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

THE STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., SANDY ARNOLD v. RON OMMEN, in his official Capacity as Director of the Wyoming Department of Administration and Information, and SANDY PADILLA, in her Official Capacity as Risk Manager

Case Heading (S-08-0091)
Case Number:S-08-0091Case Docketed On:04/22/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:THE STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., SANDY ARNOLD v. RON OMMEN, in his official Capacity as Director of the Wyoming Department of Administration and Information, and SANDY PADILLA, in her Official Capacity as Risk Manager
Full Title:THE STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., SANDY ARNOLD, Appellant (Petitioner), v. RON OMMEN, in his official Capacity as Director of the Wyoming Department of Administration and Information, and SANDY PADILLA, in her Official Capacity as Risk Manager, Appellees (Respondents).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantSandy ArnoldRonald Paul Arnold
AppelleeRon OmmenBruce A. Salzburg
Elizabeth Bartels Lance
Michael L. Hubbard
Ryan T. Schelhaas
AppelleeSandy PadillaBruce A. Salzburg
Elizabeth Bartels Lance
Michael L. Hubbard
Ryan T. Schelhaas

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Administrative Law and Procedure, Governmental Claims
Opinion Number:2009 WY 24
Citation:201 P.3d 1137 (Wyo. 2009)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/22/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/22/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/22/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/22/2008Motion - Stay - other - motion to stay contractual time period to seek review of claims processor's decision and request for expedited consideration.MotionStay - otherFinal
04/22/2008Memorandum - In support of motionMemorandumIn support of motionFinal
04/22/2008Affidavit - Other - affidavit of appellant in support of motion for stay on appeal.AffidavitOtherFinal
04/23/2008Order - Denying motion for stay.OrderDenyFinal
06/05/2008Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/21/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/21/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/22/2008Notice-Incoming - Designation of recordNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
08/04/2008Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
08/04/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant Reply BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/05/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/15/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court , three volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/19/2008Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Elizabeth Lance for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/24/2008Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Ron Arnold for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/22/2008Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Ronald Paul Arnold for appellant; Ryan T. Schelhaas, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Elizabeth Bartels Lance, Assistant Attorney General, argument by Ms. Lance for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/22/2008Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
02/24/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming in part and reversing in part, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
03/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
03/12/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
03/12/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
03/12/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
03/16/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 3/13/09. Original Green card filed in Case # S-08-0071 . Both cases had mandates issued the same day and were mailed together to Laramie County.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal