judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBINSON, JR. (VERDELL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38222
Short Caption:ROBINSON, JR. (VERDELL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 43096 , 43419 , 44492
Lower Court Case(s):Mineral Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - 1820Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/23/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/23/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-12485
09/19/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to File Fast Track Statement, Appendix and No Transcript Request Beyond Time. 01-15828
09/24/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed September 19, 2001. The clerk shall file the fast track statement, appendix, and certificate of no transcript request received on September 19, 2001. Respondent shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track response. 01-16064
09/24/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-15831
09/24/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-15833
09/24/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-15830
10/12/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 01-17243
10/17/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed October 12, 2001. Respondent's fast track response shall be served and filed on or before October 24, 2001. 01-17504
10/19/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw/Request for Appointment of Counsel. 01-17669
11/02/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We remand this appeal to the district court for the limited purpose of securing counsel for appellant. If appellant is indigent, the district court shall have 30 days within which to appoint counsel for appellant. Otherwise, the district court shall order that, within 30 days, appellant must retain counsel and counsel must enter an appearance in the district court. Within 5 days from appointment or appearance of counsel the district court clerk shall transmit to this court a copy of the district court's written or minute order, and serve a copy of this order on appellant's counsel. Thereafter, counsel shall have 10 days to file a notice of appearance in this court. Appellate counsel may file a supplemental fast track statement. Such supplemental fast track statement must be filed within twenty days of appellate counsel's appointment. 01-18346
11/19/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track response has been filed. Counsel for respondent shall file and serve the fast track response within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for respondent should not be sanctioned. 01-19312
12/10/2001Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Certified copy of Order Appointing Counsel filed in district court on December 3, 2001. Carla Butko is appointed to represent Verdell Robinson, Junior. 01-20663
12/10/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time (no original signatures except on the certificate of service) 01-20742
12/13/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Amended Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time (no original signatures - not served on D.A). 01-21002
12/18/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Amended Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time (with original signatures and service). 01-21302
01/04/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The stipulated motions submitted by the parties do not even demonstrate good cause, much less extreme need or merit and give no explanation for the need for an extension. Nonetheless, in the interest of judicial efficiency, the clerk of this court shall file, forthwith, the fast track response provisionally submitted on December 18, 2001. 02-00286
01/04/2002Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-21304
03/04/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion seeking leave of court to file Supplemental Fast Track Statement. 02-03905
03/08/2002MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Supplement Fast Track Response. 02-04222
03/12/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Affirming in Part and Remanding in Part. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED IN PART AND REMAND this matter to the district court for proceedings consistent with this order." fn7[Although this court has elected to file the appendix submitted, it is noted that it does not comply with the arrangement and form requirements of the Nevada Rules of Appellate Procedure. Failure to comply with the requirements for appendices in the future may result in the appendix being returned, unfiled, to be correctly prepared and may also result in the imposition of sanctions by this court.] NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-04418
04/09/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-04628
04/09/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/24/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 11, 2002. 02-04628
05/10/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On March 12, 2002, this court entered an order affirming the judgment of conviction in part and remanding in part. The remittitur issued on April 9, 2002. No good cause having been shown, the motion filed on March 4, 2002 to file a supplemental fast track statement and the motion for an extension of time filed on March 8, 2002 to file the supplemental fast track response are both denied. 02-08204