judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AMY JEAN BUTTLE v. JOSHUA JOHN BUTTLE

Case Heading (S-08-0090)
Case Number:S-08-0090Case Docketed On:04/21/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Domestic Relations (Title 20)
Short Title:AMY JEAN BUTTLE v. JOSHUA JOHN BUTTLE
Full Title:AMY JEAN BUTTLE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. JOSHUA JOHN BUTTLE, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAmy Jean ButtleDameione Shaw Cameron
Dean Ray Winegar
AppelleeJoshua John ButtleDonald A. Cole

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Child Custody/Visitation
Opinion Number:2008 WY 135
Citation:196 P.3d 174 (Wyo. 2008)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/21/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/21/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/21/2008Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/21/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
06/05/2008Brief - Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
06/05/2008Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
07/21/2008Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
07/21/2008Event - Hardcopy received brief of appelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/31/2008Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
08/06/2008Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/12/2008Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
08/15/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, two volumes. Volume I, original papers; Volume II, transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/15/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
11/14/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirm in part and reverse in part, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/02/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/02/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/02/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/05/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 12/3/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal