judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

JAMES DECHAINE V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 10-TX-1253
Short Caption:JAMES DECHAINE V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Tax - Tax
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CVT9947-10Filed Date:10/04/2010

Opening Event Date:10/04/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/10/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/31/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJames Dechaine NPro SeN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
David A. Bradley NN
Mary L. WilsonNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/04/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/03/2010 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed EITHER for having been UNTIMELY FILED from the June 18, 2010 dismissal OR should not be limited to the SEPTEMBER 2, 2010 denial of the Rule 60(b)motion. (BY: ETW)
11/15/2010RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE w/attachments (Submitted in ltr format address to CJ Washington)(served by DCCA)
11/30/2010 On consideration of this court's November 3, 2010 OTSC and the response thereto and it appearing that appelalnt's letter which the trial court construed as a D.C. Super. Ct. Civ. R. 60(b) motion was received in chambers on June 30, 2010 w/n the time period permitted by DC A pp. R. 4(a)(4)(v), and...NO TRANSCRIPT IS NEEDED FOR THIS APPEAL, it is ORDERED that the NOVEMBER 3, 2010 OTSC IS HEREBY VACATED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal is deemed as having been taken from both the dismissal order and the denial of the DC Super. Ct. Civ. R. 60(b) motion. It is *****MORE*****
11/30/2010 F/ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index in accordance with R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (BY: ETW) LW
12/10/2010RECORD INDEX
12/10/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/14/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC) elp
01/13/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF attached appendix
01/13/2011APPENDIX- aplt
02/18/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo)for 30 days.
02/23/2011 On consideration of appellee's consent motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before March 21, 2011. (JAC) elp
03/18/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 30 days
03/29/2011APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE - to aple's motion for extension of time to file brief
04/04/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief, and the response thereto, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before April 20, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (ETW) elp
04/20/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to 5/20/11
05/06/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before May 20, 2011. No further requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (ETW) elp
05/11/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
05/12/2011TMC - motion for summary affirmance - oppo
05/23/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to aple's motion for Summary Affirmance.
07/29/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
07/29/2011FiledAffirmed (Order) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Terry, Senior Judge)
08/31/2011FiledMandate