judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

OHIO OIL COMPANY, ET AL. v. BASCOM GILES, ET AL.

Case: A-2687
A-2687
05/05/1950
MISC PETITION
OHIO OIL COMPANY, ET AL.
BASCOM GILES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
01/25/1951Response to Brief filedRelator
01/15/1951Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
12/21/1950Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/07/1950Response to Reply filedRespondent
10/27/1950Reply to ResponseRelator
10/19/1950Response to Brief filedRespondent
05/12/1950Response to PetitionRespondent
05/05/1950Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/14/1951Order from Lower Court filed
01/25/1951Response to Brief filed
01/15/1951Brief in Support of Petition
01/02/1951Response to Motion filed
12/21/1950Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/06/1950Opinion issued
11/10/1950Miscellaneous letter
11/07/1950Response to Reply filed
10/27/1950Reply to Response
10/19/1950Response to Brief filed
06/06/1950Supplement to Motion filed
05/12/1950Response to Petition
05/05/1950Brief in Support of Petition
05/05/1950Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Bascom Giles, et al.Respondent
Ohio Oil Company, et al.Relator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information