judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: GUIDELNES AND PROCEDURES FOR CERTAIN JUDICIAL EXPENDITURES

Administrative Case: ADKT 0180
Short Caption:IN RE: GUIDELNES AND PROCEDURES FOR CERTAIN JUDICIAL EXPENDITURESCourt:Supreme Court
Classification:Administrative - ADKT - ADKTCase Status:Case Closed
Filed Date:03/24/1994Public Hearing:
Closed Date:08/04/1995

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
03/24/1994Administrative CaseFiled Petition. 94-00067
03/31/1995Administrative CaseFiled Petition. 95-00100
06/07/1995Administrative CasePublic Hearing held on the Administrative Docket
07/31/1995Administrative CaseFiled Order Adopting Supreme Court Rule 7A. Effective September 1, 1995. 95-00101
08/04/1995Administrative CaseIssued Notice to the State Bar of Nevada for publication in the next issue of Nevada Lawyer.
08/04/1995Administrative CaseCase Closed.