judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP OF SOTO, MINOR WARDS

Case Information: 38242
Short Caption:IN RE: GUARDIANSHIP OF SOTO, MINOR WARDSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - G22595Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:08/08/2001 / Davidson, MichaelSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:11/13/2003 at 11:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:11/13/2003How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/27/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Christopher A. White--check no. 148.
07/27/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12730
08/08/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Michael D. Davidson. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/10/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 19-20, 2001. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. 01-13585
08/15/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-13878
08/16/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Michael D. Davidson.
08/27/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-14491
08/30/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Michael D. Davidson.
08/30/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The Settlement Judge recommends that this appeal be removed from the Settlement Program pursuant to NRAP Rule 16(A). 01-14710
09/10/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Appellants' Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-15210
09/13/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Opposition to Respondents Motion to Dismiss). 01-15517
09/28/2001MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Permission to File Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-16368
11/21/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from Earley Savage law firm requesting status of motion to file reply to opposition filed on 9/28/01. MISSING 01-19626
09/04/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. Respondents have moved to dismiss this appeal. Appellants oppose the motion contending that this appeal should not be dismissed for mootness because the issues on appeal contain 'important questions of law that are capable of repetition but that often will evade review.' As a general rule, an appellate court is limited in its consideration of a case to matters appearing in the record made in the lower court. We conclude, under the circumstances presented herein, that it is appropriate for this court to consider the affidavits of Charles I. Woody and Carl W. Bruce, ordained ministers of Jehovah's Witnesses, presented by appellants. We deny respondents' motion to dismiss. We further deny respondents' motion for leave to file a reply to the opposition. Pursuant to the written request of the settlement judge and good cause appearing, we remove this appeal from the settlement conference program. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Transcript Video Services shall have 30 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the transcripts of proceedings requested by appellants pursuant to the transcript request filed on August 10, 2001. In the event the transcripts requested by appellants were previously prepared and filed in the district court prior to the docketing of this appeal, Transcript Video Services shall inform this court in writing that the transcripts requested by appellants were previously prepared and filed in the district court. Appellants should include copies of any previously prepared transcripts in the appendix to the opening brief. Appellants shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-15232
09/23/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellants: 30 days from the date of this order. We suspend the briefing schedule and the transcript preparation by Transcript Video Services pending further order of this court. 02-16424
10/21/2002MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response to Order to Show Cause. 02-18236
11/12/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Briefing Reinstated. On October 21, 2002, appellants filed a response to the order to show cause. We conclude that this appeal may proceed, and we reinstate the briefing schedule and the transcript preparation. fn4[Transcript Video Services shall have 30 days from the date of this order to prepare and file the transcripts of proceedings requested by appellants pursuant to the transcript request filed on August 10, 2001 or shall inform this court in writing that the transcripts requested by appellants were previously prepared and filed in the district court.] Appellant shall have 90 days from the date of this order to file the opening brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed pursuant to NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-19434
11/18/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Non-Order/Non-Payment. 02-19838
11/18/2002MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Associate Out-of-State Counsel. 02-19840
12/09/2002Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: June 19-20, 2001. To Court Reporter: Transcript Video Services. 02-21031
01/08/2003TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: 6/19/01, 6/20/01. Court Reporter: Alice Eastgate. 03-00396
02/07/2003MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief. 03-02186
02/07/2003BriefReceived Amicus Brief. Brief of Amicus Curiae Christian Congregation of Jehovah's Witnesses. 03-02191
02/12/2003BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: 02/10/03. 03-02451
02/12/2003AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 03-02452
02/24/2003MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: April 11, 2003. 03-03001
04/10/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Respondent Valley Hospital Medical Center and Michelle Nichols, R.N.'s Motion to Extend Deadline for Filing Answering Brief. (Title on Motion erroneously states "reply" brief). 03-06048
04/11/2003Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed April 10, 2003. Respondents shall have until Arpil 26, 2003, to file and serve the answering brief. 03-06143
04/25/2003MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion to Extend Time for Respondents Valley Hospital Medical Center and Michele Nichols, R.N.'s Answering Brief. 03-07040
04/28/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. filed April 25, 2003. Respondents shall have until May 27, 2003, to file and serve the answering brief. No further extensions of time shall be permitted absent demonstration of extreme and unforeseeable circumstances. 03-07172
05/28/2003BriefFiled Answering Brief. 03-08904
06/30/2003BriefFiled Reply Brief. 03-10990
07/25/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Granting Motion to Associate Counsel and Filing Amicus Curiae Brief. Counsel for appellants, Nevada attorney Eric Palacios, has filed a motion to associate New York attorney Donald T. Ridley as co-counsel for appellants pursuant to SCR 42. Cause appearing, we grant the unopposed motion. Mr. Ridley shall be permitted to appear on behalf of appellants in this appeal. Mr. Palacios shall be responsible for all matters presented by appellants. The Christian Congregation of Jehovah's Witnesses, Inc. has filed a motion for leave to file an amicus curiae brief. Cause appearing, we grant the unopposed motion. NRAP 29. The clerk of this court shall file the amicus curiae brief received on February 7, 2003. 03-12604
07/25/2003BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Brief of Amicus Curiae Christian Congregation of Jehovah's Witnesses. 03-02191
09/17/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on November 13, 2003, at 11:30 a.m. (En Banc)
10/29/2003Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
11/05/2003Order/IncomingFiled Executive Order. District Judge Archie E. Blake is appointed to sit in the place of Justice Myron E. Leavitt. 03-18397
11/13/2003Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. EN BANC
04/06/2004Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed." fn1[The Honorable Archie E. Blake, Judge of the Third Judicial District Court, was designated by the Governor to sit in place of the Honorable Myron E. Leavitt, Justice. Nev. Const. art. 6, sec.4.] Before the Court En Banc. Author: Per Curiam. Majority: Shearing C.J., Agosti, Rose, Becker, Maupin, and Gibbons, JJ. Blake, D.J. 120 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 18. EN BANC. 04-06278
05/04/2004RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 04-07218
05/04/2004Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
05/13/2004RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 6, 2004. 04-07218