judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID PEEBLES V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 10-CT-1271
Short Caption:DAVID PEEBLES V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CTF12722-10Filed Date:10/08/2010

Opening Event Date:10/08/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/02/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/31/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid Peebles Y
Edward E. SchwabNY
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Rosalyn Calbert GroceNY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/26/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Edward Schwab, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
10/26/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Edward Schwab, Esquire
11/03/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
12/02/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (94pgs/Tape) 10/4/10 proc. w/CD
12/02/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/07/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
12/07/2010RECORD INDEX
12/07/2010RECORD COPIES
01/18/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF to January 25, 2011 (no oppo).
01/26/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (TO SUSPEND BRIEFING) LW
02/07/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT shall W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for LACK OF JURISDICTION as an associate judge's review of a magistrate judge's decision is a prerequisite for appeal. See DC CODE 11-1732(k) (2010 Supp). It is *****MORE*****
02/07/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTIONS FOR EXTENSION OF TIME AND TO SUSPEND BRIEFING ARE DENIED. (BY: ETW) LW
02/07/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
02/28/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - dated 2/7/11
03/10/2011 ORDERED that this APPEAL IS HEREBY DISMISSED for lack of jurisdiction. SEE DC CODE 11-1732 (K)(2001). (GLPRFE) (rm)
03/10/2011DISMISSED
03/31/2011MANDATE ISSUED