judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARTIN JAMES PETERSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0112)
Case Number:S-08-0112Case Docketed On:05/30/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Public Administration 6-5-101 - 6-5-307
Short Title:MARTIN JAMES PETERSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MARTIN JAMES PETERSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMartin James PetersonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
David E. Westling
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
05/30/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
05/30/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
05/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
07/14/2008Motion - Stay briefing - unopposedMotionStay briefing - unopposedFinal
07/15/2008Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's motion to stay briefing scheduleEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/16/2008Order - Stay briefingOrderStay briefingFinal
09/02/2008System - Status check - other - Contacted public defender's office regarding status of motion to correct illegal sentence. They received the State's response today. No hearing has been set yet before the district court.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
09/17/2008Correspondence - Incoming other - received copy of email from Judge Arnold requesting that counsel prepare an order on the motion to correct sentence.CorrespondenceIncoming otherFinal
10/10/2008Motion - Dismiss - voluntary with waiverMotionDismiss - voluntary with waiverFinal
10/10/2008Event - Hardcopy received - motion for voluntary dismissal of appeal; and waiver of appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
10/13/2008Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/13/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal