Case: A-5653
A-5653
02/02/1956
Application for Writ of Error
FIRST NATIONAL BANK OF WICHITA FALLS, ET AL.
FIRST BANK OF CHICO, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/22/1956 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
02/02/1956 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/25/1956 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
05/22/1956 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
05/09/1956 | Opinion issued | | ||
02/29/1956 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/29/1956 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/29/1956 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/29/1956 | Document received (See Remarks) | | ||
02/02/1956 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Filing granted | | |
02/02/1956 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
First Bank of Chico, et al. | Respondent | |
First National Bank of Wichita Falls, et al. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information