judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-5666
A-5666
02/08/1956
Application for Writ of Error
TOM W. PEARCE
PAT STOKES, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/23/1956Response to Brief filedPetitioner
04/26/1956Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
03/09/1956Response to PetitionRespondent
02/08/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/23/1956Opinion issued
05/23/1956Response to Brief filed
04/26/1956Supplemental Brief filed
04/04/1956Document received (See Remarks)
03/09/1956Response to Petition
02/08/1956Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/08/1956Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Pat Stokes, et al.Respondent
Tom W. PearcePetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information