judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NAVARRO A. HAMMOND V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CO-1273
Short Caption:NAVARRO A. HAMMOND V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Other - Den. Of Post-Conviction Relief
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:FEL6898-92Filed Date:10/13/2010

Opening Event Date:10/13/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/26/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/18/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/19/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/04/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantNavarro A. Hammond YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Katherine M. KellyYY

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
10/13/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
10/22/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on October 13, 2010, and it appearing that appellant was found eligible for cost-waived status in the trial court, and it further appearing that no transcript is needed for this appeal, it is ORDERED that a briefing order will be issued upon the filing in this court, by the Clerk of the Superior Court, of the record index and record copies in accordance with D.C. App. R. 11 (b)(3)(A). (By: JAC)
10/26/2010RECORD INDEX
10/26/2010RECORD COPIES
10/26/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/29/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (CASTILLO)
11/16/2010CHANGE OF ADDRESS RECEIVED from Appellant: Navarro A. Hammond USP Canaan P.O. Box 300 Waymart, PA 18472
12/14/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF
01/05/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed within 20 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
01/21/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL ******FILED AS THE BRIEF PER 5/18/11 ORDER LW
01/25/2011TMC - motion for summary reversal - oppo
03/25/2011APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSE to Aplt's Motion for Summary Reversal until April 27, 2011
03/29/2011 ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED and APPELLEE'S RESPONSE, if any, to appellant's motion for summary reversal shall be filed NO LATER THAN APRIL 27, 2011. (JAC) LW
04/27/2011APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION - to aplt's motion for summary reversal
04/27/2011RECEIVED - aple's brief w/appdx attached
05/17/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION for extension of time to file reply to aple's oppo
05/18/2011 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY REVERSAL IS DENIED...It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's alternate request for relief IS GRANTED and the Clerk shall file APPELLANT'S MOTINO AS HIS BRIEF and FILE APPELLEE'S LODGED BRIEF. It is ****MORE****
05/18/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF-SUMMARY REVERSAL FILED AS BRIEF SEE 5/18/11 ORDER
05/18/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/18/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME IS DENIED AS MOOT. It is FURTHER ORDERED that this appeal shall be scheduled before a merits division as soon as the calendar permits. (RZTHPR)
05/18/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/18/2011FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I - TMC
05/27/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
06/24/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL
07/15/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion for appointment of counsel and directing a supplemental brief, if any
07/15/2011FiledAppointing Counsel/CJA Walter Booth, Esquire (Appellant)
08/12/2011FiledNotice Received from court-appointed counsel regarding Appellant's intent to file a Suplemental Brief; and that Appellant will be requesting 40 days. (Appellant)
09/14/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte that the supplemental brief of appellant shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order and 30 days thereafter, if any, the supplemental brief of appellee
10/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Supplemental Brief by 60 days (Appellant)Granted
11/02/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to fil the supplemental brief until December 23, 2011
11/03/2011FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw (Appellant)Granted
11/15/2011FiledORDER SUA SPONTE - Withdraw Appointed Counsel Walter Booth, Esquire, is granted and Erek Barron, Esquire, is appointed to represent appellant and directing newly-appointed counsel to file a supplemental brief or a statement within 30 days from the date of this order
11/15/2011FiledAppointing Counsel/CJA Erek Barron, Esquire (Appellant)
12/15/2011FiledSupplemental Brief (Appellant)
12/15/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
01/19/2012FiledSupplemental Brief (Appellee)
08/27/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/19/2012FiledSubmitted to Judges Washington, Glickman, Thompson
11/08/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Judges Washington, Glickman, Thompson)
11/15/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
12/04/2012FiledMandate